Hillesheim v. Balance Point Properties, LLC

Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Balance Point Properties, LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv00144
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF DISMISSALOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order whi ch will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the joint motion (Filing No. 30 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Balance Point Properties, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Filing No. 18 ) is denied. Balance Point Properties, LLC shall serve a responsive pleading or other appropriate motion in response to the First Amended Complaint within fourteen days after the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Balance Point Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balance Point Properties, LLC
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?