Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Janice Jones
Defendant: David G. Buell, Commissioner of Social Security, Robert K. Cox and Jacqueline E. Crawford-Apperson
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2017cv00163
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is before the Court on plaintiff Janice Jones's ("Jones") Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 28 ). That motion is granted, and Jones is permitted to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Commissioner's Motion to Affirm Commissioner's Decision (Filing No. 22 ) is granted. Jones's Motion (Filing No. 21 ) to reverse the Commissioner's decision is denied. A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will be entered this date. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Order to Show Cause (Filing No. 18 ) is terminated. Plaintiff Janice Jones shall have until October 16, 2017, to move for an order reversing the Commissioner of Social Security's decision and, in doing so, must comply with General Order 2015-05, specifically paragraph 2 of that General Order. The Clerk of Court shall mail Janice Jones a copy of General Order No. 2015-05. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed) (JSF)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff Janice Jones shall have until September 25, 2017 to show cause why her complaint should not be dismissed for failure to follow the required procedures. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order together with six summons forms and six copies of Form 285 to Jones for service of process on the United States. Jones must complete the Marshal's Form 285 and the summons forms, and return them to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court will sign the summons forms and forward them with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms as directed) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline E. Crawford-Apperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?