Planet Group, Inc. v. Geiken
Plaintiff: Planet Group, Inc.
Defendant: Kimberli Geiken
Case Number: 8:2017cv00169
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice, ECF No. 26 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed, without prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The Findings and Recommendation of Chief United States Bankruptcy Judge Thomas L. Saladino, ECF No. 16 , are adopted. The reference of bankruptcy is withdrawn. Plaintiff's response to the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 5 , must be filed on or before October 26, 2017. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Plaintiff Planet Group, Inc. and Defendant Kimberli Geiken's Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 17 ) is adopted. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 5 ) is extended to twenty-one (21) days after Chief Judge Smith Camp issues an Order on the Findings and Recommendations (Filing No. 16 ) on the Motion to Withdraw the Reference submitted by Judge Saladino. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planet Group, Inc. v. Geiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberli Geiken
Represented By: Patrick J. Barrett
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Represented By: Kathryn A. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planet Group, Inc.
Represented By: Patrice D. Ott
Represented By: J. Daniel Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?