Velez et al v. Bohren Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Paublo Velez, Martiniana Velez and Paola Velez
Defendant: Bohren Logistics, Inc. and Tony Weekly, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00175
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER - The Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, ECF No. 251 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER - In light of the current status of this litigation, Defendants motions are granted. The Court finds good cause to amend the scheduling order in this litigation. Plaintiffs have filed a motion for dispositive sanctions which remains pending bef ore the Court. This motion will not be ripe for ruling until May 10, 2019. After the resolution of this motion, other previously-filed motions will be reasserted. Given the pending motion and the potential for additional, extensive motion practice, there simply is not enough time for the Court to rule on these motions and keep the August 20, 2019 trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Filing No. 25 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the First Amended Complaint on or before December 29, 2017. Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter Dates (Filing No. 27 ) is denied, without p rejudice. After Plaintiffs file and serve the First Amended Complaint, all parties may meet and confer and provide the Court with jointly proposed new case progression deadlines, including the expert disclosure deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez et al v. Bohren Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohren Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Weekly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Paublo Velez
Represented By: Danny C. Leavitt
Represented By: Terrence J. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martiniana Velez
Represented By: Danny C. Leavitt
Represented By: Terrence J. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Velez
Represented By: Danny C. Leavitt
Represented By: Terrence J. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?