The Maids International, Inc . v. Maids on Call, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Maids International, Inc .
Defendant: Maids on Call II, LLC, Maids on Call, LLC, Sara Rock, Maryanne Scussel, Stacey Scussel and Timothy Scussel
Case Number: 8:2017cv00208
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment by consent and award of attorney's fees and costs 57 is granted. Judgment is entered against defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $59,500.00; and plaintiff is awarded $2,060.00 in attorney fees and costs in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Confession of Judgment.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CCB)
December 13, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, ECF No. 55 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for purpo ses of enforcing the settlement agreement between the parties, the order for permanent injunction by consent agreed to by the parties, and the confession of judgment signed by defendants. The Clerk will terminate the case for statistical purposes. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
September 25, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff, The Maids International, Inc. ("TMI") as follows: Defendants and all persons or entities acting in concert with them are restrained and enjoi ned from infringing upon TMI's trademarks, trade names, service marks, and related marks; Defendants and all persons or entities acting in concert with them are restrained and enjoined from operating a competing business in violation of the non-compete, non-solicitation, and post-termination provisions, as stated in Articles 18 and 19 of the applicable Franchise Agreements; and Defendants and all persons or entities acting in concert with them must comply with the obligations imposed upon termination or expiration, as stated in Article 18 of the Franchise Agreements. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
July 13, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Defendant's 27 Motion to Extend Time to respond to Complaint and to File Opposing Papers to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All Defendants shall have an extension of time to July 31, 2017, to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. 2. All Defendants shall have an extension of time to July 24, 2017, to file a brief and evidence opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. 21 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Maids International, Inc . v. Maids on Call, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maids on Call II, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maids on Call, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Rock
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryanne Scussel
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Scussel
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Scussel
Represented By: Eric D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Maids International, Inc .
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Raymond J. Konz
Represented By: Craig P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?