Powers v. Central Transport, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert L. Powers
Defendant: Central Transport, LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv00212
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Filing 35 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
June 5, 2018 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed per the filing of the stipulation for dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared. This case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. (JSF)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The parties have settled this case. On or before June 18, 2018, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
May 17, 2018 Filing 32 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 5/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Settlement Conference held. Appearances made on the record. Procedures to be followed for the settlement conference stated. Conference continued off the record. Settlement reached and put on the record in a sealed portion of the hearing. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Patrick M. Flood; Appearance for Defendant: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios; Courtroom Deputy: Sara Pankoke; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. Time Start: 10:28 PM; Time Stop: 2:56 PM; Time in Court: 4 Hours 28 Minutes. (SLP)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the Defendant's unopposed request, the Settlement Conference is now set to commence at 10:30 a.m. on May 17, 2018, in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
May 8, 2018 Filing 30 Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER - Upon the Court's review of the the parties' Joint Statement emailed to the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge on May, 4, 2018, the telephone scheduled for May 10, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. A Telephone Conference with counsel is set for 5/10/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for the purpose of reviewing any outstanding issues that may be relevant prior to the settlement conference. Conference Instructions are located at Filing No. #19 in this case. All remaining case progression deadlines are stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
April 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiff's Discovery Responses by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Robert L. Powers (Flood, Patrick)
April 16, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Robert L. Powers (Flood, Patrick)
February 27, 2018 Filing 25 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Central Transport, LLC (Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by August 17, 2018. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for December 28, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in my chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A three (3) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of January 14, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, United States District Judge. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
February 12, 2018 Filing 23 Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Request for Admissions, Interrogatories & Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
February 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Robert L. Powers (Flood, Patrick)
January 29, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Service Re: Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER - On the Court's own motion due to a scheduling conflict, the Planning Conference is rescheduled for Tuesday, 2/20/2018 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Case conference instructions are located at Filing No. #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF CASE - Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by January 16, 2018 addressing mediation requirements. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on February 16, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. A separate order will be filed with conferencing instructions. Trial is tentatively set for the month of September 2018, and is tentatively scheduled for four (4) trial days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 10, 2017 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING LETTER - In completing the required Rule 26(f) Report, counsel should use the revised "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the Court's website. The Rule 26(f) Report should be filed with the Court no later than November 13, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
October 10, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Central Transport, LLC (Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
August 15, 2017 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
August 11, 2017 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Central Transport, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Defendant represents that the parties have been discussing settlement in good faith and jointly agreed it would not be necessary for Defendant to file a responsive pleading during those discussions. Upon the representation that the Motion is unopposed by Plaintiff, Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to October 10, 2017. The show cause deadline is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion to Strike. The Unopposed Motion at Filing No. #8 is stricken for the reason that it was filed in error in the wrong case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 9, 2017 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Strike UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave To File A Responsive Pleading Out of Time #8 by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
August 9, 2017 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave To File A Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie)
August 9, 2017 Filing 8 *STRICKEN* UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave To File A Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Attorney Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios on behalf of Defendant Central Transport, LLC.(Whittamore-Mantzios, Melanie) Modified on 8/10/2017 to strike per Text Order 11 (KLF).
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff has until August 25, 2017, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Following Magistrate Judge Gossett's retirement on June 30, 2017, all pending civil and criminal cases previously assigned to Magistrate Judge Gossett are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nelson for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett no longer assigned to the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CCB)
June 28, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Central Transport, LLC defendant Robert L. Powers on 6/24/2017. (Flood, Patrick)
June 20, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Central Transport, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
June 20, 2017 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett assigned. (LAC)
June 20, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Central Transport, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Flood, Patrick)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Central Transport, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3469453), by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Robert L. Powers(Flood, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Central Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport, LLC
Represented By: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Powers
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?