Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc. et al v. Principal Life Insurance Company
Petitioner: Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc. and Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc. Savings and Retirement Plan
Respondent: Principal Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2017cv00214
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0004
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Arctic Glacier U.S.A. and the Plan's Petition to Compel Arbitration and Other Dispute Resolution Procedures (Filing No. 1 ) is granted. Principal's alternative Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 7 ) is denied. Th e parties are directed to proceed to arbitration pursuant to Article IV of the Service and Expense Agreement. This case is stayed pending arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the progress of arbitration proceedings every ninety (90) days beginning December 1, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to set an initial Status Report Deadline of December 1, 2017. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LAC)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that to facilitate a thorough review of Arctic Glacier's Petition, the Court will give the parties an opportunity to supplement the record with additional evidence. The parties shall electronically file any such evidence as an "Index of Evidence" in support of or opposition to the Petition on or before August 15, 2017, and may include a brief summary of the evidence not to exceed five pages. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/19/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/21/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc. et al v. Principal Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rose
Represented By: Richard S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arctic Glacier U.S.A., Inc. Savings and Retirement Plan
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rose
Represented By: Richard S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore M. Becker
Represented By: Brian A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?