Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2017cv00217
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Union Pacific's motion to dismiss (filing 51 ) is granted. The Brotherhood's motion for summary judgment (filing 46 ) is denied. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - As requested in the Plaintiff's motion, (Filing No. 44 ), which is hereby granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment is April 6, 2018. The deadline for Defendant to file and Defendant's Answer or resp onse to Plaintiff's amended complaint, its response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, and any cross-motion for summary judgment is May 7, 2018. The deadline for filing Plaintiff's reply to its own motion for summary judgment and its response to any cross-motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant is June 4, 2018. The deadline for Defendant's reply to its own motion for summary judgment is July 2, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - 1) Plaintiff's amended motion (Filing No. 38 ) is granted and Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 36 ) is denied as moot. 2) Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, (Filing No. 30 ), is denied as moot.3) The deadline for Plaintif f to file its amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to its Filing 38 motion, is February 28, 2018, with Defendant's Answer or response to the amended complaint due on or before March 14, 2018.4) The deadline for P laintiff to file a motion for summary judgment is March 23, 2018. 5) The deadline for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment is April 23, 2018.6) The deadline for filing Plaintiff's reply to its own motion for summary judgment and its response to any cross-motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant is May 21, 2018.7) The deadline for Defendant's reply to its own motion for summary judgment is June 18, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Defendant's answer or response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before August 24, 2017. As to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Filing No. 8 ), Defendant's response shall be filed on or befor e August 24, 2017, with any reply filed on or before September 25, 2017. Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss and accompanying brief shall be filed or before August 24, 2017, with Plaintiff's response filed on or before September 25, 2017, and any reply filed on or before October 9, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Clifford A. Godiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?