Doe v. Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges
Case Number: 8:2017cv00265
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 01:00 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion to quash, for protective order, and for recovery of attorney fees, (Filing No. 92 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER - The pre-motion conference call previously set for today is cancelled. Plaintiff's motion for protective or to quash the notice to depose Maren Chaloupka shall be filed on or before December 11, 2018, with Defendants response due on or before December 21, 2018. No reply shall be filed absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to compel, (Filing No. 57 ), is denied. Plaintiff's motion to stay, (Filing No. 59 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Defendant's objection, (8:17CV31, Filing No. 70 ), is sustained. Plaintiff's motion for protective order, (8:17CV31, Filing No. 64 ), is denied. Plaintiff's motion for protective order, (8:17CV265, Filing No. 50 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - that the motion to permit Sunshine M. Bradshaw to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. 53 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 42 43 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 26 Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STRICKEN - ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on or before January 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB) Modified on 1/2/2018 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 28 . (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?