Lexington Insurance Company v. Advance Services, Inc

Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Defendant: Advance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00296
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Amend Case Progression Order (Filing No. 42 ) is granted, and the earlier progression order is amended. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
February 23, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' Stipulation for Plaintiff to Amend Complaint to Add APC Company, Inc., as an Additional Subrogor (Filing No. 34 ) is approved. Plaintiff may file its First Amended Complaint on or before March 9, 2018. Defendant may fil e an Amended Answer 14-days after Plaintiff files its First Amended Complaint. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer and Joinder of Necessary Party (Filing No. 30 ) is deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
October 23, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff's Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting 21 is stricken as incomplete. On or before October, 27, 2017, the parties shall meet and confer and provide the Court with a joint report of their conference pursuant to Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this Court's order may result in appropriate sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) and 37(b)(2)(A)(ii)-(vii). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. Advance Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Marx
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Represented By: Shivani Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?