Carter v. Muldoon et al
Plaintiff: John M. Carter
Defendant: Does 1-25 inclusive, William Muldoon, Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center and Dave Stolz
Case Number: 8:2017cv00319
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 85 , filed by Plaintiff John Carter, is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pleadings (Filing No. 65 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Objection, ECF No. 50 , filed by Plaintiff John Carter is denied. The Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 26 , filed by Defendants William Muldoon and Dave Stolz is granted, in part, as follows: The claim for tortious interference with a business relationship or expectancy against Defendants William Muldoon and Dave Stolz, in their individual capacities, is dismissed, with prejudice. The Motion is otherwise denied. The Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 51 , filed by Defendant Nebra ska Law Enforcement Training Center is granted. Defendant Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center is dismissed from this action. Plaintiff John Carter's claims for damages under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against Defendants Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center and William Muldoon and Dave Stolz, in their official capacities, are dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff John Carter's claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for prospective injunctive relief and his claim under Nebraska law for tor tious interference with a business expectancy against Defendants Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center and William Muldoon and Dave Stolz, in their official capacities, are dismissed, without prejudice. Defendants William Muldoon and Dave Stolz, in their individual capacities, will respond to the remaining claims on or before May 18, 2018. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order, ECF No. 35, filed by Defendant Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center, is overruled; The Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 41, filed by Plaintiff John Carter, is denied; The Motion to Set Aside Default, ECF No. 33, filed by Defendant Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center, is granted; and Defendant Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center shall file a responsive pleading to Carter's Complaint on or before March 28, 2018. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Plaintiff's requested default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) against Defendant Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion for Defendants to Properly Preserve and Catalog All Physical Evidence (Filing No. 22 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Filing Fee (Filing No. 12 ) is granted, and Plaintiff may submit his $400.00 filing fee on or before November 22, 2017. Plaintiff advises that his address, as it appears on the summonses previously file d with the court in Filing No. 6 , is correct. Therefore, after Plaintiff's filing fee is received, the Clerk of Court shall sign, seal, and issue such summonses to Plaintiff for service on each of the defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Plaintiff must complete such service of process within 60 days of the date on which Plaintiff's filing fee is received by the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order contained in his Complaint (Filing No. 1 at CM/ECF p. 18) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is denied, pursuant to his written statement within filing no. 2, "Plaintiff can pay the filing fee if the Court permits the case to be filed and the fees to be paid in 15 days." Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in Plaintiff being dismissed from this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 29, 2017: deadline for Plaintiff to pay $400.00 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Muldoon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Stolz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?