BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Canning Logistics Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Canning Logistics Service LLC and Doran Post
Case Number: 8:2017cv00461
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter is before the court following default judgment, (Filing No. 21 ) against defendant Canning Logistics Service LLC on August 31, 2018 and entry of an amended order of dismissal, (Filing No. 37 ) on March 7, 2019 as to defendant Doran Post. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant)(TCL)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Court has examined the previous dismissal, Filing No. 36 , and has determined that such dismissal applies to only one defendant, not both defendants. The previous dismissal entered by this Court, Filing No. 36 , is hereby vacated due to a clerical error. This case is dismissed with prejudice without costs or attorneys' fees against Doran Post. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 35 Stipulation for Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice with both parties in this action to bear its own fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (CS)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Execution (Filing No. 28 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall issue a Writ of Execution against Canning Logistics Service LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) Modified on 11/27/2018 to reflect copy mailed to defendant (LKO).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Clerk's entry of default (Filing No. 10) is set aside with respect to defendant Doran Post. Defendant Post shall answer or otherwise plead within three weeks of the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Canning Logistics Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canning Logistics Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doran Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?