Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC and Justin R. VonLoh
Case Number: 8:2017cv00490
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 130 Motion to Continue. The debtor's examination and show cause hearing scheduled for July 12, 2018 are continued. Defendant Justin VonLoh and a designated officer or member of Defendant Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, sh all appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on August 27, 2018, to testify for determining what property or assets may be subject to execution or garnishment toward satisfaction of the judgment rendered against them and to show cause why they should not be held in contempt of court for failing to provide copies of all books, records, documents, papers, and other ma terials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating from January 1, 2017, to the present, prior to April 17, 2018, as previously ordered by this Court. Failure to appear at the hearing may result in a warrant being issued for the Defendants' arrest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CHARGING ORDER (Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC)- Plaintiff Allied World Specialty Insurance Company is hereby granted a charging order on Defendant Justin VonLoh's transferable interest in Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC. Pursuant to Neb . Rev. Stat. § 21-142, this charging order constitutes a lien on Defendant Justin VonLoh's transferable interest and requires Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, to pay over to Allied World Specialty Insurance Company any distribution tha t would otherwise be paid to Defendant Justin VonLoh. Defendant Justin VonLoh shall not assign, sell, transfer, pledge, convey, or encumber any interest in Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, absent further Order from this Court. Plaintiff Allied Wo rld Specialty Insurance Company shall have the right to make all inquiries, and review Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC's books and records concerning the ongoing financial affairs of the company, as reasonably necessary to assure compliance with this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER that the debtor's examination and show cause hearing scheduled for June 18, 2018 are continued. Defendant Justin VonLoh and a designated officer or member of Defendant Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on July 12, 2018, to testify for determining what property or assets may be subject to execution or garnis hment toward satisfaction of the judgment rendered against them. Defendants shall produce all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, da ting from January 1, 2017, through the date of the hearing. Defendants shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on July 12, 2018, to show cause why they should not be held in contempt of court for failing to provide copies of all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, incom e, or indebtedness, dating from January 1, 2017, to the present, prior to April 17, 2018, as previously ordered by this Court. Failure to appear at the hearing may result in a warrant being issued for the Defendants' arrest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that the debtor's examination and show cause hearing scheduled for June 4, 2018 are continued. Defendant Justin VonLoh and a designated officer or member of Defendant Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on June 18, 2018, to testify for determining what property or assets may be subject to execution or garnis hment toward satisfaction of the judgment rendered against them. Defendants shall produce all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, d ating from January 1, 2017, through the date of the hearing. Defendants shall deliver copies of the foregoing documents to Plaintiff's counsel on or before June 13, 2018. For reference, the contact information for Plaintiff's counsel is as follows: Jarrod D. Reece Likes Meyerson Hatch LLC, 444 Regency Parkway Drive, Suite 100, Omaha, NE 68114,(402) 506-4600, jreece@lmhlawfirm.com. Additionally, Defendants shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in C ourtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on June 18, 2018, to show cause why they should not be held in contempt of court for failing to provide copies of all books, records, documents, p apers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating from January 1, 2017, to the present, prior to April 17, 2018, as previously ordered by this Court.Failure to appear at the hearing may result in a warrant being issued for the Defendants' arrest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER - The debtor's examination and show cause hearing scheduled for May 23, 2018 are continued. Defendant Justin VonLoh and a designated officer or member of Defendant Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, shall appear before United States Magist rate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on June 4, 2018, to testify for determining what property or assets may be subject to execution or garnishment towar d satisfaction of the judgment rendered against them. Defendants shall produce all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating from Janu ary 1, 2017, through the date of the hearing. Defendants shall deliver copies of the foregoing documents to Plaintiffs counsel on or before June 4, 2018. For reference, the contact information for Plaintiff's counsel is as follows:Jarrod D. Reec eLikes Meyerson Hatch LLC444 Regency Parkway Drive, Suite 100,Omaha, NE 68114(402) 506-4600jreece@lmhlawfirm.com Additionally, Defendants shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S . Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on June 4, 2018, to show cause why they should not be held in contempt of court for failing to provide copies of all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contai n information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating from January 1, 2017, to the present, prior to April 17, 2018, as previously ordered by this Court. Failure to appear at the hearing may result in a warrant being issued for the Defendants' arrest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A CHARGING ORDER SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED (Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION AND FOR DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THEY SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT - The Verified Motion to Continue Debtor's Examination and for Order to Show Cause (ECF # 76 ) is grante d. The debtor's examination currently scheduled for April 26, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., is cancelled. Defendant Justin VonLoh and a designated officer or member of Defendant Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC, shall appear before United States Magis trate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 1:30 p.m. on May 23, 2018, to testify for determining what property or assets may be subject to execution or garnishment to ward satisfaction of the judgment rendered against them. Defendants shall produce all books, records, documents, papers, and other materials that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating fro m January 1, 2017, through the date of the hearing. Defendants shall provide copies of the foregoing documents to Plaintiff's counsel at least seven (7) business days before the hearing. For reference, the contact information for Plaintiff� 39;s counsel is as follows: Jarrod D. Reece, Likes Meyerson Hatch LLC, 444 Regency Parkway Drive, Suite 100, Omaha, NE 68114. Additionally, Defendants shall appear before United States Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis in Courtroom 7 at the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 1:30 p.m on May 23, 2018, to show cause why they should not be held in contempt of court for failing to provide copies of all books, records, documents, papers, and other materia ls that contain information concerning their respective assets, property, income, or indebtedness, dating from January 1, 2017, to the present, prior to April 17, 2018, as previously ordered by this Court. Failure to appear at the hearing may result in a warrant being issued for the Defendants' arrest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip G. Alber
Represented By: Bryan S. Hatch
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Electrical Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin R. VonLoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?