Fortress Iron L.P. v. Fairway Building Products, LLC

Plaintiff: Fortress Iron L.P.
Defendant: Fairway Building Products, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00076
Filed: February 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortress Iron L.P. v. Fairway Building Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Building Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortress Iron L.P.
Represented By: Luke C. Holst
Represented By: John J. May
Represented By: Paul V. Storm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?