Robinson v. The Lancaster County Court et al

Plaintiff: Eric M. Robinson
Defendant: Nebraska Court of Appeals, The Lancaster County Court, The Lancaster County District Court and The Nebraska Supreme Court
Case Number: 8:2018cv00111
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis as a non-prisoner. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine wh ether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. The clerk of the court is directed to update the court's records to reflect Plaintiff is no longer liable for the remaining balance of the filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 12, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court will not take any action on the emails submitted by Plaintiff and the emails will not be made part of the court's record. Plaintiff shall refrain from submitting further emails to the clerk's office for fili ng. Plaintiff, as a registered CM/ECF user, shall file electronically any document he wishes the court to consider himself using CM/ECF. In accordance with the court's April 6, 2018 Memorandum and Order (filing no. 11 ), Plaintiff must either f ile a new request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees by May 7, 2018. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 6, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must either file a new request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO 240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: May 7, 2018: deadline for Plaintiff to file new IFP application or pay filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 3, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no action will be taken on the email submitted by Plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
March 29, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.34 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response t o a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the cou rt. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Apri l 30, 2018: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. The Lancaster County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lancaster County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lancaster County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nebraska Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?