Heimann v. University of Nebraska Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Heimann
Defendant: Dr. Surinder K. Batra, University of Nebraska Board of Regents and University of Nebraska Medical Center
Case Number: 8:2018cv00128
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Deposition deadline set for 7/14/19. Non-Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr.. Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Progression Order. (Filing No. 23 .) The Motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (CCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heimann v. University of Nebraska Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Surinder K. Batra
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Represented By: Amy L. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska Board of Regents
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Represented By: Amy L. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska Medical Center
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Represented By: Amy L. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Heimann
Represented By: Adam P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?