Collis v. West Corporation
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. Collis
Defendant: West Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv00133
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Sex Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - that the final progression order, at Filing No. 9 , is amended as follows: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Laurie Smith Camp, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 2, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebra ska, a 9:00 a.m. on October 15, 2019, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on October 1, 2019 at 1:00 p.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on September 3, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assig ned to this case to participate in the conference. The parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on August 30, 2019. The deposition deadline is May 15, 2019. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is June 10, 2019. The parties shall comply with all other stipulations and agreements recited in their Rule 26(f) planning report that are not inconsistent with this or der. All requests for changes of deadlines or settings established herein shall be directed to the undersigned magistrate judge, including all requests for changes of trial dates. Such requests will not be considered absent a showing of due diligence in the timely progression of this case and the recent development of circumstances, unanticipated prior to the filing of the motion, which require that additional time be allowed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - that the final progression order, at Filing No. 9, is amended as follows: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge, in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 Sou th 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on September 17, 2019, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collis v. West Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. Collis
Represented By: Alexis S. Mullaney
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?