China Life Insurance Company v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Plaintiff: China Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00213
Filed: May 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Upon review of the notice of settlement filed by counsel for the parties (Filing No. 69), IT IS ORDERED: On or before November 30, 2020, the parties shall electronically file a joint motion for approval of their stipulated settlement and provide a draft order to the trial judge for his signature. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings, Filing No. 50 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 44 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the defendant's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 19 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: China Life Insurance Company v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: China Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A. Uhlenkamp
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?