Heit v. Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.
Plaintiff: James M Heit and James M. Heit
Defendant: Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00297
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Serving Discovery by Attorney Christopher E. Hoyme on behalf of Defendant Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc. (Hoyme, Christopher)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 4/5/19. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Telephone Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 09:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney James B. McVay on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Heit.(McVay, James)
June 29, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher E. Hoyme on behalf of Defendant Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc..(Hoyme, Christopher)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/30/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc. (Hoyme, Christopher)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LKO)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of and Petition for Removal against James M Heit from Douglas County District Court, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-4936 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3710543) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Christopher E. Hoyme on behalf of Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.(Hoyme, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heit v. Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Heit
Represented By: James B. McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Heit
Represented By: James B. McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oral Maxillo-Facial Surgeons, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?