Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan v. McGill Restoration, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan and International Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, Local Union No. 15
Defendant: McGill Restoration, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00366
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 26, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Patrice D. Ott on behalf of Defendant McGill Restoration, Inc..(Ott, Patrice)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant McGill Restoration, Inc. on 9/5/2018. (Clark, Aaron)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant McGill Restoration, Inc., by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan(Clark, Aaron)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant McGill Restoration, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to McGill Restoration, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Clark, Aaron)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McGill Restoration, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3734100), by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan, International Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, Local Union No. 15(Clark, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan v. McGill Restoration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, Local Union No. 15
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGill Restoration, Inc.
Represented By: Patrice D. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?