SendSig, LLC v. Toast, Inc.

Plaintiff: SendSig, LLC
Defendant: Toast, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00405
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #21 for attorney David L. Simson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3766846 by Attorney David L. Simson on behalf of Defendant Toast, Inc..(Simson, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #19 for attorney Srikanth Reddy. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3765554 by Attorney Srikanth Reddy on behalf of Defendant Toast, Inc..(Reddy, Srikanth)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Toast, Inc. shall have an extension of time to November 1, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Attorney Todd C. Kinney on behalf of Defendant Toast, Inc..(Kinney, Todd)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Lisa Zimmer, Corporate Service Agent, Incorp Services, Inc. for defendant Toast, Inc. on 8/27/2018. (Lee, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Kevin S. Kudlac. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Kevin S. Kudlac Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3753006 by Attorney Kevin S. Kudlac on behalf of Plaintiff SendSig, LLC.(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Cabrach J. Connor. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Jennifer T. Lee. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Cabrach J. Connor Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3752959 by Attorney Cabrach J. Connor on behalf of Plaintiff SendSig, LLC.(Connor, Cabrach)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Jennifer Tatum Lee Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3752939 by Attorney Jennifer T. Lee on behalf of Plaintiff SendSig, LLC.(Lee, Jennifer)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Cabrach J. Connor has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jennifer T. Lee has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kevin S. Kudlac has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. Complaint filed on 08/24/2018. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Toast, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (CS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff SendSig, LLC.(Saathoff, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Toast, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Saathoff, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Toast, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3750114), by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of SendSig, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saathoff, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SendSig, LLC v. Toast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toast, Inc.
Represented By: Srikanth Reddy
Represented By: Todd C. Kinney
Represented By: David L. Simson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SendSig, LLC
Represented By: Kevin S. Kudlac
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Represented By: Jennifer T. Lee
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?