Price v. Lancaster County Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: James S. Price, III
Respondent: Lancaster County Department of Corrections and Brad Johnson
Case Number: 8:2018cv00420
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner James S. Price, III. (LKO)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #4 ) is denied as moot. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 27, 2018 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid by Bonnie J. Price on behalf of James S. Price, III on 09/27/2018. Receipt number 8049007, in the amount of $5.00. (KLF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner James S. Price, III. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (LAC)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner James S. Price, III. (LKO)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerks office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 (Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 10, 2018: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner James S. Price, III. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Lancaster County Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James S. Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lancaster County Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?