Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00445
Filed: September 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:153
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to December 14, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Clifford A. Godiner on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Godiner, Clifford)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to November 23, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Clifford A. Godiner on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Godiner, Clifford)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co. on 10/2/2018. (O'Connor, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
September 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Union Pacific Railroad Co. regarding Complaint, #1 . (O'Connor, Robert)
September 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Enforcement of Arbitrators Award against Union Pacific Railroad Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3769855), by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT (O'Connor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Represented By: Clifford A. Godiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?