Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Jackson Boyz LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Laura A. Jackson, Daniel A. Jackson, II and Jackson Boyz LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00448
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Laura A. Jackson, Jackson Boyz LLC, Daniel A. Jackson, II (Hitz, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard F. Hitz on behalf of Defendant Laura A. Jackson.(Hitz, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard F. Hitz on behalf of Defendant Daniel A. Jackson, II.(Hitz, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard F. Hitz on behalf of Defendant Jackson Boyz LLC.(Hitz, Richard)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Laura A. Jackson on 10/20/2018; Jackson Boyz LLC on 10/20/2018; Daniel A. Jackson, II on 10/20/2018. (Janis, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Jackson Boyz LLC, Laura A. Jackson and Daniel A. Jackson, II. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action filed on 9/25/18 regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyright with a copy of complaint #1 ). (LKO)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Jackson Boyz LLC, Daniel A. Jackson, II and Laura A. Jackson regarding Complaint, #1 . (Janis, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ryan R. Janis on behalf of Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Janis, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laura A. Jackson, Jackson Boyz LLC, Daniel A. Jackson, II ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3771540), by Attorney Ryan R. Janis on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Jackson Boyz LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura A. Jackson
Represented By: Richard F. Hitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Jackson, II
Represented By: Richard F. Hitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Boyz LLC
Represented By: Richard F. Hitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?