Vogel v. D & D Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Barry W Vogel and Barry W. Vogel
Defendant: D&D Foods, Inc. and D & D Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00457
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: Nebraska District Court
0 Judge: Michael D Nelson
1 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is extended to 11/27/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
November 12, 2018 9 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Rule 26(f) Planning Conference Report Scheduling Letter #8 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 11, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc., Corporate Parent Hy-Vee, Inc. for D & D Foods, Inc.. by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants D & D Foods, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
October 10, 2018 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by D & D Foods, Inc. (Gerdes, Torrey)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 10, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 3, 2018 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant D & D Foods, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
September 26, 2018 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant D&D Foods, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Barry W Vogel from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-7301 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3773063) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of D&D Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gerdes, Torrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. D & D Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry W Vogel
Represented By: Douglas R. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry W. Vogel
Represented By: Douglas R. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&D Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & D Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?