Eich et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Eich and April Eich
Defendant: Best Moving & Storage Company, Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC and Coleman Worldwide Moving L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00472
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING LETTER - In completing the required Rule 26(f) Report, counsel should use the revised "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the Court's website. The Rule 26(f) Report should be filed with the Court no later than December 27, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #16 by Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Tricker, Jennifer)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #2 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Plaintiffs, by Attorney Lindsey A. Schuler on behalf of Scott Eich, April Eich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schuler, Lindsey)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER approving #14 Stipulation as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs' Amended Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #13 is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint [13-1] on or before November 14, 2018. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #12 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION regarding AMENDED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint #13 by Attorney Lindsey A. Schuler on behalf of Plaintiffs April Eich, Scott Eich.(Schuler, Lindsey)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Attorney Lindsey A. Schuler on behalf of Plaintiffs April Eich, Scott Eich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Schuler, Lindsey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Attorney Lindsey A. Schuler on behalf of Plaintiffs April Eich, Scott Eich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Schuler, Lindsey)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Lindsey A. Schuler on behalf of Plaintiffs April Eich, Scott Eich (Schuler, Lindsey)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Coleman Worldwide Moving L.L.C..(Tricker, Jennifer)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Defendants Coleman Worldwide Moving L.L.C., Allied Van Lines, Inc., Best Moving & Storage Company.(Tricker, Jennifer)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent North American Van Lines, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA Worldwide, Inc. for Allied Van Lines, Inc.. by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Defendants Coleman Worldwide Moving L.L.C., Allied Van Lines, Inc., Best Moving & Storage Company, SIRVA, Inc., SIRVA Worldwide, Inc., North American Van Lines, Inc..(Tricker, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Best Moving & Storage Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Allied Van Lines, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEF in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Defendants Allied Van Lines, Inc., Best Moving & Storage Company, Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC.(Tricker, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Defendants Allied Van Lines, Inc., Best Moving & Storage Company, Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC.(Tricker, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI 18-7769 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3778638) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tricker, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eich et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Moving & Storage Company
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Worldwide Moving L.L.C.
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Eich
Represented By: Robert J. Kirby
Represented By: Steven G. Ranum
Represented By: Lindsey A. Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Eich
Represented By: Robert J. Kirby
Represented By: Steven G. Ranum
Represented By: Lindsey A. Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?