Rand v. Stanosheck et al

Plaintiff: Timothy E Rand and Timothy E. Rand
Defendant: Aschoff Construction, Inc., Jonathan P Stanosheck, Pacific Realty Comme Aschoff Construction, Inc. and Jonathan P. Stanosheck
Case Number: 8:2018cv00481
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike #7 by Attorney Elizabeth R. Cano on behalf of Defendants Aschoff Construction, Inc., Jonathan P. Stanosheck.(Cano, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike #7 by Attorney Christopher P. Welsh on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy E. Rand.(Welsh, Christopher)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike #7 by Attorney Elizabeth R. Cano on behalf of Defendants Aschoff Construction, Inc., Jonathan P. Stanosheck.(Cano, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike by Attorney Elizabeth R. Cano on behalf of Defendants Aschoff Construction, Inc., Jonathan P. Stanosheck.(Cano, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Jonathan Stanosheck defendant Timothy E. Rand on 10/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Return Receipt)(Welsh, Christopher)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Aschoff Construction, Inc. defendant Timothy E. Rand on 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Return Receipt)(Welsh, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Aschoff Construction, Inc. and Jonathan P Stanosheck. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Jonathan P. Stanosheck and Aschoff Construction, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Welsh, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3781917), by Attorney Christopher P. Welsh on behalf of Timothy E Rand(Welsh, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rand v. Stanosheck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy E Rand
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy E. Rand
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aschoff Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P Stanosheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Realty Comme Aschoff Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Stanosheck
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?