Doubletap Defense, LLC v. Hornady Manufacturing Co.
Plaintiff: Doubletap Defense, LLC
Defendant: Hornady Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00492
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF in support of AMENDED MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, #2 , MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, #2 #37 #38 by Attorney Robert J. Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC.(Kaufman, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 42 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #33 and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co..(Barry, Andre)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion to Extend.Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co.'s reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss (filing #33 ) and its brief in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (filing #38 ) shall be filed on or before December 3. 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 27, 2018 Filing 40 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co..(Barry, Andre)
November 21, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE regarding Brief #34 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #33 by Attorney Robert J. Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kaufman, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 38 AMENDED MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, #2 , MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, #2 #37 by Attorney Robert J. Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Kaufman, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, #2 by Attorney Robert J. Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Kaufman, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - that the motion to permit Joseph C. Chancey and Sonya T. Jacobs to withdraw (Filing No. #32 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
October 31, 2018 Filing 34 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #33 by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co..(Barry, Andre)
October 31, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co..(Barry, Andre)
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Hornady Manufacturing Co. (Barry, Andre)
October 24, 2018 Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #30 for attorney Robert J. Kaufman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
October 24, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3790203 by Attorney Robert J. Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC.(Kaufman, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #28 for attorney Matthew D. Treco. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
October 23, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3789663 by Attorney Matthew D. Treco on behalf of Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC.(Treco, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Doubletap Defense, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 25 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sonya T. Jacobs has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 24 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph C. Chancey has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert J. Kaufman has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew D. Treco has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02810. Original electronic file received.
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #13 , to the extent the Motion seeks transfer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska and to CLOSE this case in the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/17/2018. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Case electronically transferred to District of Nebraska. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Preliminary Deadlines Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative to Transfer Venue #15 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/11/18. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Submission of #15 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Kaufman, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan D. Clark. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/29/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 29, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Clark Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph C. Chancey added appearing on behalf of Hornady Manufacturing Co. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8083353) (jkm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Andre R. Barry. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/26/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Clark Pro Hac Vice by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 24, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andre R. Barry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8083323). Attorney Andre R. Barry added appearing on behalf of Hornady Manufacturing Co. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 23, 2018 RETURN of #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Clark Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8083353) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hornady Manufacturing Co. by Hornady Manufacturing Co..(Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue with Brief In Support by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Chancey, Joseph) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 8/21/2018 (hfm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Clerks Notation re #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan D. Clark Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8083353)by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andre R. Barry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8083323)by Hornady Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Amended Complaint. Hornady Manufacturing Co. Answer due 8/20/2018. Pretrial deadlines outlined within the Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/8/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer, File Initial Disclosures, Hold Rule 26(f) Conference, and File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treco, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Truman Jacobs on behalf of Hornady Manufacturing Co. (Jacobs, Sonya) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Chancey on behalf of Hornady Manufacturing Co. (Chancey, Joseph) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Doubletap Defense, LLC. Hornady Manufacturing Co. waiver mailed on 6/8/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Treco, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Treco, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dempsey Treco on behalf of Doubletap Defense, LLC (Treco, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/26/2018. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hornady Manufacturing Co. filed by Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Kaufman, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Doubletap Defense, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7931171) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doubletap Defense, LLC v. Hornady Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doubletap Defense, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Treco
Represented By: Robert J. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornady Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Sonya T. Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph C. Chancey
Represented By: Nathan D. Clark
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?