Whittaker v. Weinrich Truck Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerra Whittaker
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated, Weinrich Truck Line, Inc. and United Wisconsin Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv00506
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Accident Fund Insurance Company of America for United Wisconsin Insurance Company. by Attorney Robert M. Livingston on behalf of Defendants United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, Accident Fund Insurance Company of America.(Livingston, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of Plaintiff Jerra Whittaker.(Blakeman, Cletus)
December 17, 2018 Filing 26 LETTER Tolling Agreement by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of Plaintiff Jerra Whittaker.(Blakeman, Cletus)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
December 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of LIEN by Attorney Robert M. Livingston on behalf of Defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company (Livingston, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #17 by United Wisconsin Insurance Company (Livingston, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance for United Wisconsin Insurance Company by Attorney Robert M. Livingston on behalf of Defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company (Livingston, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company on 12/6/2018. (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company regarding Amended Complaint. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted Change of Address as to defendant United Wisconsin Insurance Company. (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to United Wisconsin Insurance Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of Jerra Whittaker(Blakeman, Cletus)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Weinrich Truck Line, Inc. on 11/8/2018. (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Cargill, Incorporated on 11/13/2018. (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted Due to Service at Alternate Address as to defendant Cargill, Incorporated. (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to defendant Cargill, Incorporated at a different address than original summons issued on 11/6/18. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Cargill, Incorporated, United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Weinrich Truck Line, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MBM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Cletus W. Blakeman regarding Complaint #1 . (Blakeman, Cletus)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Attorney Letter, #3 is stricken for the following reason(s): Attorney Clete Blakeman is already admitted to the Court under Cletus Blakeman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 *STRICKEN* ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Clete Blakeman has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO) Modified on 10/26/2018 to strike per strike order (LKO).
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3791566), by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Jera Whittaker(White, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittaker v. Weinrich Truck Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weinrich Truck Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Wisconsin Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert M. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerra Whittaker
Represented By: Terry A. White
Represented By: Cletus W. Blakeman
Represented By: Clete Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?