Battle-ABC, LLC v. Soldier Sports, LLC

Plaintiff: Battle-ABC, LLC
Defendant: Soldier Sports, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00508
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 26, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Defendant Soldier Sports, LLC.(Hale, William)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Defendant Soldier Sports, LLC (Hale, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Soldier Sports, LLC on 11/5/2018. (Jeffries, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Plaintiff Battle-ABC, LLC.(Jeffries, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Soldier Sports, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Battle-ABC, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent numbers 8,931,488 and 9,333,413. Complaint filed on 10/26/18. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Soldier Sports, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Jeffries, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Soldier Sports, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3791970), by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Battle-ABC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit '488 Patent, #2 Exhibit '413 Patent)(Jeffries, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle-ABC, LLC v. Soldier Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battle-ABC, LLC
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soldier Sports, LLC
Represented By: William J. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?