Hillesheim v. Petrow's Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Petrow's L.L.C. and Petrow's Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00516
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Petrow's L.L.C., Petrow's Restaurant, Inc. (Kunhart, Ryan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons re-Issued as to defendant Petrow's L.L.C. and Petrow's Restaurant, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the previously issued Summons #5 is stricken for the following reason: it contains the incorrect date. The Clerk of Court shall reissue Summons with the corrected date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 *STRICKEN* Summons Issued as to defendant Petrow's L.L.C. and Petrow's Restaurant, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) Modified on 10/30/2018 to strike per strike order (LKO).
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Petrows L.L.C. regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Petrows Restaurant, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3792852), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Petrow's Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrow's L.L.C.
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrow's Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?