Hillesheim v. JJ Greve LLC
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: JJ Greve LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00518
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING LETTER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/22/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by JJ Greve LLC (Olson, Steven)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 26, 2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (unopposed) by Attorney Steven J. Olson on behalf of Defendant JJ Greve LLC.(Olson, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant JJ Greve LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to JJ Greve LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JJ Greve LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3793356), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. JJ Greve LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ Greve LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?