Hillesheim v. DMDS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: DMDS, INC.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00521
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond on or before January 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.(CEW)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of Defendant DMDS, Inc..(Bernard, Colin)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - This case is reassigned to Chief District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (CS)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse herself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CS)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond on or before December 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLA)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of Defendant DMDS, Inc..(Bernard, Colin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant DMDS, INC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LKO)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to DMDS, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DMDS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3795206), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. DMDS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMDS, INC.
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?