Geisert v. Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co.

Plaintiff: Jaima Geisert
Defendant: Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 8:2018cv00530
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Nebraska District Court
0 Judge: John M Gerrard
1 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney A. Stevenson Bogue on behalf of Defendant Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co..(Bogue, A.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/7/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 4, 2018 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
December 4, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co. (Bogue, A.)
November 8, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 8, 2018 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LKO)
November 8, 2018 2 Summons Requested as to Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co. regarding Complaint #1 . (Miller, Bryce)
November 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co., by Attorney Bryce M. Miller on behalf of Jaima Geisert (Receipt ANEDC-3800072, paid $400.00) (Miller, Bryce) Modified on 11/9/2018 to add receipt information. (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geisert v. Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Equipment Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Ruth A. Horvatich
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: A. Stevenson Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaima Geisert
Represented By: Bryce M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?