Rabbe v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa A. Rabbe
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Wells Fargo, N.A., Government National Mortage Association and Homeservices Lending, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00561
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Alison Gutierrez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A..(Gutierrez, Alison)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #20 by Attorney Alison Gutierrez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A..(Gutierrez, Alison)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Alison Gutierrez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A..(Gutierrez, Alison)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (Amended) by Attorney Alison Gutierrez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A..(Gutierrez, Alison)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. On or before January 31, 2019, Wells Fargo shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Alison Gutierrez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A..(Gutierrez, Alison)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Homeservices Lending, LLC on 1/7/2019. (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Homeservices Lending, LLC. (Original mailed to pro se plaintiff for service.) (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Homeservices Lending, LLC. (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wells Fargo, N.A. on 12/24/2018. (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Government National Mortage Association on 12/26/2018. (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Homeservices Lending, LLC regarding Complaint - Pro Se #1 . (LKO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa A. Rabbe. (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #3 , is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff's pursuit of a properly-served motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant's Government National Mortage Association, Homeservices Lending, LLC, and Wells Fargo, N.A. (Originals mailed to pro se plaintiff for service.) (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER - Plaintiff's "Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction," (Filing No. #3 ), shall be placed on the public docket. The clerk shall issue only the summons for the parties named in Plaintiff's caption, copies of which are attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff's "Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction," (Filing No. #3 ), shall be placed on the public docket. The clerk shall issue only the summons for the parties named in Plaintiff's caption, copies of which are attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa A. Rabbe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LKO) Modified on 12/4/2018 to release restriction per order #6 (LKO).
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa A. Rabbe. (LKO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Wells Fargo, N.A., Government National Mortage Association, Homeservices Lending, LLC and John Does 1-100 with receipt number 8049784, in the amount of $400; filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Lisa A. Rabbe. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabbe v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Rabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Alison Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeservices Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?