Hillesheim v. Select Food Mart Inc
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Select Food Mart Inc
Case Number: 8:2018cv00563
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Alton E. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Select Food Mart Inc.(Mitchell, Alton)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Joinder of Necessary Defendant by Attorney Alton E. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Select Food Mart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Lease Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Alton)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Select Food Mart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Select Food Mart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer) (Mitchell, Alton)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Select Food Mart Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the defendant's motion to dismiss (filing #5 ) and motion for joinder (filing #7 ) are denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party to join mandatory party pursuant to FRCP 19 by Attorney Alton E. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Select Food Mart Inc.(Mitchell, Alton)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Alton E. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Select Food Mart Inc (Mitchell, Alton)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Alton E. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Select Food Mart Inc.(Mitchell, Alton)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Select Food Mart Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Select Food Mart Inc regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Food Mart Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3815020), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Select Food Mart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Food Mart Inc
Represented By: Alton E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?