Kumar v. Whittaker et al
Plaintiff: Rohit Kumar
Defendant: Joseph P. Kelly, Matthew G. Whittaker and Jessie K. Liu
Case Number: 8:2018cv00578
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jessie K. Liu on 12/27/2018. (TCL)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joseph P. Kelly on 12/26/2018. (TCL)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Matthew G. Whittaker on 12/27/2018. (TCL)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court may request an attorney to represent a person who is unable to afford counsel. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1); NEGenR 1.3(h). But the plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis, and there is nothing in the record or the plaintiff's motion establishing indigency. Accordingly, the Court cannot appoint counsel to represent him, and his motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Rohit Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary material, #2 Supplement Evidentiary material)(Kumar, Rohit)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Matthew G. Whittaker, Joseph P. Kelly, and Jessie K. Liu. Originals given to plaintiff for service. (LKO)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Matthew G. Whittaker, Joseph P. Kelly and Jessie K. Liu. 3 Summonses issued, with receipt number 8049932, in the amount of $400; filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Rohit Kumar. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar v. Whittaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohit Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie K. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?