Vettel v. United States of America

Petitioner: Crystal R. Vettel
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. The Petitioner has not responded to the government's motion for extension of time #9 , and the deadline for responding has passed. The motion is deemed unopposed. The United States' response to the Motion to Quash #1 shall be filed on or before March 8, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The government's amended petition #8 supersedes the original petition #1 . As such, the operative petition is now the amended petition, filing #8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Martin M. Shoemaker on behalf of Respondent United States of America.(Shoemaker, Martin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION TO QUASH against Defendant United States of America, by Attorney David R. Reid on behalf of Crystal R. Vettel(Reid, David) Modified on 2/8/2019 to reflect document is a motion.(JAB)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Order on Motion to Extend, 6 is stricken for the following reason: the document is a duplicate of document number 5 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN - TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend. Due to the government shutdown, the deadline for the government's response to Petitioner's Motion to Quash Summonses is extended to February 20, 2019.The return date on the summonses is held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLA) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add "stricken" pursuant to Order 7 . (JAB)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend. Due to the government shutdown,The deadline for the government's response to Petitioners Motion to Quash Summonses is extended to February 20, 2019.The return date on the summonses is held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's MOTION to Quash #1 by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of Respondent United States of America.(Kelly, Laurie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #2 for attorney David R. Reid. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3836108 by Attorney David R. Reid on behalf of Petitioner Crystal R. Vettel.(Reid, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash with receipt number 8050142 in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney David R. Reid on behalf of Petitioner Crystal R. Vettel. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LKO) Modified on 1/8/2019 to restrict pursuant to Judge Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vettel v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Represented By: Martin M. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crystal R. Vettel
Represented By: David R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?