Bone v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura A Bone and Laura A. Bone
Defendant: Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc. and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00008
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendants Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. (Wentz, Kenneth)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before March 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Amanda J. Fray on behalf of Defendants Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc..(Fray, Amanda)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Marriott International, Inc. and Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Mullaney, Alexis)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Mullaney, Alexis)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3836881), by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Laura A Bone(White, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bone v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A Bone
Represented By: Alexis S. Mullaney
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A. Bone
Represented By: Alexis S. Mullaney
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Amanda J. Fray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?