Krause v. City of Omaha

Plaintiff: Randall S. Krause
Defendant: City of Omaha
Case Number: 8:2019cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend on behalf of Plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (KLF)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Case Conference Instructions). ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with filing #11 )(DKM)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/5/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (DKM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 The City's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 by City of Omaha (Himes, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Omaha filed by pro se plaintiff Randall S. Krause. (KLF)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The City of Omaha shall have an extension of time to March 4, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Timothy G. Himes, Sr. on behalf of Defendant City of Omaha.(Himes, Timothy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha on 1/14/2019. (KLF)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant City of Omaha. (KLF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Omaha. 1 Summons issued with receipt number 8050232, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of Randall S. Krause. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krause v. City of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall S. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Represented By: Timothy G. Himes, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?