Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA v. Mens

Plaintiff: Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA
Defendant: Kathy Mens
Case Number: 8:2019cv00014
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
1 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Unless this Memorandum and Order is later modified, the Preliminary Injunction Order, ECF No. #16 , remains in force throughout the pendency of this litigation. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Kathy Mens (Dittrick, Kathryn)
February 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in support of Injunctive Relief by Attorney David P. Kennison on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA.(Kennison, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence in Support of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Farm Credit's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Kathryn A. Dittrick on behalf of Defendant Kathy Mens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kathy Mens In Support of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Farm Credit's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Dittrick, Kathryn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in opposition to Brief #5 Farm Credit's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Filing #4) by Attorney Kathryn A. Dittrick on behalf of Defendant Kathy Mens.(Dittrick, Kathryn)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 SURETY BOND in the amount of $1000.00, bond number 39S221919 posted by Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA. (ADB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Injunction Bond by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA (Hedican, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESTRICTED Exhibit A. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (TCL)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #4 , filed by Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, is granted, as follows: Pending resolution of this matter, Mens and those acting in active concert or participation with her: a. shall not call on or solicit the business of, or sell to, or service (directly or indirectly), on Mens's own behalf or in association with or on behalf of any other individual or entity, including without limitation her employer FBN Insurance LLC (FBN), any of the customers of Farm Credit with whom Mens actually did business and had personal contact while employed by Farm Credit, except to the extent such activities are unrelated to and not competitive with the business, products, or services that Mens offered or provided on behalf of Farm Credit and cannot adversely affect Farm Credit's relationship or volume of business with such customers; and b. shall not call on or solicit the business of, or sell to, or service (directly or indirectly, on Mens's own behalf or in association with or on behalf of any other individual or entity, including without limitation her employer FBN, the persons or entities listed on the attached Exhibit A, except to the extent such activities are unrelated to and not competitive with the business, products or services that Mens offered or provided on behalf of Farm Credit and cannot adversely affect Farm Credit's relationship or volume of business with such customers. Such restrictions include refraining from issuing crop insurance quotes or working in the AIP systems on their policies or databases. Farm Credit shall post a $1,000.00 cash bond with the Clerk of Court in support of this preliminary injunction. Exhibit A, introduced at the hearing, is received only for purposes of Farm Credit's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the Clerk of Court is instructed to File Exhibit A under restricted status. On or before February 8, 2019, Defendant Kathy Mens may file a brief in opposition to Farm Credit's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and on or before February 18, 2019, Farm Credit may file a reply to Mens's opposition, if any. The Motion for Expedited Discovery, ECF No. #6 , is denied as moot.Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT LIST from Motion hearing held on January 18, 2019. (LAC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Motion Hearing held 01/18/2019 regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 and Motion to Expedite Discovery #6 . Hearing held in Omaha. Defendant did not appear. Evidence by the Plaintiff. Oral arguments by the plaintiff and defendant. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 is granted. Written order forthcoming. Motion to Expedite Discovery is denied as moot. Defendant shall file a brief on or before February 8, 2019. Responses, if necessary, by the Plaintiff shall be filed on or before February 18, 2019. Appearance for plaintiff: Christopher R. Hedican; Appearance for defendant: Kathryn A. Dittrick; Courtroom Deputy: Laura Coyle; Court Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Time Start: 2:31 p.m.; Time Stop: 2:59 p.m.; Total Time: 29 mintues. (LAC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Rhianna A. Kittrell by Attorney Rhianna A. Kittrell on behalf of Defendant Kathy Mens (Kittrell, Rhianna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Kathryn A. Dittrick by Attorney Kathryn A. Dittrick on behalf of Defendant Kathy Mens (Dittrick, Kathryn)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #4 and MOTION for Expedited Discovery, ECF No. #6 . Motion Hearing set for 01/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Plaintiff is ordered to make best efforts to notify Defendant of the hearing and this order, and will report to the Court at the hearing on its efforts to notify. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA (Hedican, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendant Kathy Mens. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION Expedited Discovery #6 by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA.(Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Expedited Discovery by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA.(Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiff Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA.(Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Kathy Mens regarding Complaint #1 . (Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Farm Credit Services of America, ACA for Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA. by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Plaintiffs Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Farm Credit Services of America, ACA.(Hedican, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kathy Mens ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3841338), by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedican, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA v. Mens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Mens
Represented By: Rhianna A. Kittrell
Represented By: Kathryn A. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: David P. Kennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?