BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. L & O Trucking, LLC
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: L & O Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00028
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against L & O Trucking LLC by Attorney James K. Haney on behalf of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James K. Haney in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - BHB's Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant L & O Trucking, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant) (LKO)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against L & O Trucking LLC by Attorney James K. Haney on behalf of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant L & O Trucking, LLC on 2/6/2019. (Haney, James)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to defendant L & O Trucking, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L & O Trucking, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3847600), by Attorney James K. Haney on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. L & O Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & O Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?