Nichols v. First Data Resources, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tina L. Nichols
Defendant: First Data Resources, LLC, Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. and First Data Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv00035
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant First Data Corporation shall have an extension of time to April 4, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Cody E. Brookhouser on behalf of Defendant First Data Corporation.(Brookhouser, Cody)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. shall have an extension of time to April 4, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., First Data Corporation, by Attorney Alexis S. Mullaney on behalf of Tina L. Nichols(Mullaney, Alexis)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. (Jensen, Marnie)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants First Data Resources, LLC and Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Mullaney, Alexis)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to FIRST DATA RESOURCES, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Mullaney, Alexis)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against First Data Resources, LLC, Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3851050), by Attorney Terry A. White on behalf of Tina L. Nichols(White, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. First Data Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina L. Nichols
Represented By: Terry A. White
Represented By: Alexis S. Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corporation
Represented By: Cody E. Brookhouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?