Webb v. Packaging Corporation of America

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Webb
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00065
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Plaintiff Jacqueline Webb (Brandon, Kelly)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 1/31/20. Jury Trial set for 8/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 11:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Kelly K. Brandon on behalf of Plaintiff Jacqueline Webb.(Brandon, Kelly)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - The parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) report by March 27, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Packaging Corporation of America (Millsap, Sarah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America.(Millsap, Sarah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Packaging Corporation of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 1) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . Exhibit B - Declaration of Gerald Bjurman by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America.(Millsap, Sarah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Jacqueline Webb from District Court of Douglas County Nebraska, Case number CI 18-7875 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3866008) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Sarah J. Millsap on behalf of Packaging Corporation of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Millsap, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Packaging Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Represented By: Catherine A. Cano
Represented By: Sarah J. Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Webb
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Represented By: Stephanie J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?