Nesbit v. NE/Health and Human Services Department

Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Nesbit
Defendant: NE/Health and Human Services Dept, NE/Health and Human Services Department and Joseph Wilson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00072
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: John M Gerrard
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Ann Nesbit. (KLF)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joseph Wilson on 2/20/2019. (KLF)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant NE/Health and Human Services Department on 2/20/2019. (KLF)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Ann Nesbit. (KLF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Joseph Wilson. (KLF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants NE/Health and Human Services Department and Joseph Wilson on behalf of pro se plaintiff Barbara Ann Nesbit. (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant NE/Health and Human Services Dept. (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NE/Health and Human Services Dept with receipt number 8050710 in the amount of $400.00 on behalf of pro se plaintiff Barbara Ann Nesbit. 1 Summons issued. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesbit v. NE/Health and Human Services Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NE/Health and Human Services Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NE/Health and Human Services Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Nesbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?