Prime Foods for Processing and Trading v. Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Prime Foods for Processing and Trading
Defendant: Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00073
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to April 30, 2019, to file a brief in response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #7 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Brief #8 , MOTION to Dismiss #7 by Attorney Faisal Gill on behalf of Plaintiff Prime Foods for Processing and Trading.(Gill, Faisal)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself inany proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon reviewof the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall,and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #7 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Gill, Faisal)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Faisal Gill on behalf of Plaintiff Prime Foods for Processing and Trading.(Gill, Faisal)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Complaint, #1 . Exhibit 9 - Amricana Food Analysis by Attorney Faisal Gill on behalf of Plaintiff Prime Foods for Processing and Trading.(Gill, Faisal)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Prime Foods for Processing and Trading ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3868400)Prime Foods for Processing and Trading (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Greater Omaha, #3 Exhibit Pro Forma Invoices, #4 Exhibit Emails, #5 Exhibit Fraudulent Pro Forma Invoices, #6 Exhibit Emails, #7 Exhibit Emails, #8 Exhibit Emails, #9 Exhibit Emails, #10 Exhibit Emails)(Gill, Faisal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Foods for Processing and Trading v. Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Foods for Processing and Trading
Represented By: Faisal Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Fahey
Represented By: Jordan W. Adam
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?