Edwards v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ryan J. Edwards
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00076
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Service: Discovery by Attorney Anastasia Wagner on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Wagner, Anastasia)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Initial 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Attorney James L. Cox, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan J. Edwards.(Cox, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Service: Initial Disclosures by Attorney Anastasia Wagner on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Wagner, Anastasia)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due January 21, 2020. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney James L. Cox, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan J. Edwards.(Cox, James)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/10/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Anastasia Wagner on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Wagner, Anastasia)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Wagner, Anastasia)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 2/19/2019. (Cox, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Union Pacific Railroad regarding Complaint #1 . (Cox, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3869678), by Attorney James L. Cox, Jr. on behalf of Ryan J. Edwards(Cox, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Anastasia Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan J. Edwards
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?