Chieftain Distribution, LLC v. US Wine Transport et al

Plaintiff: Chieftain Distribution, LLC
Defendant: US Wine Transport, Trinity Road, Inc., CrossCountry Freight Solutions, NTC Logistics, Nebraska Transport Company and Nebraska Transport Co., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00081
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting 21 Text Oral Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Trinity Road, Inc. d/b/a U.S. Wine Transport shall have an extension of time to April 29, 2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and the Cross Claims filed by CrossCountry Courier, Inc. and and Nebraska Transport Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED TEXT ORAL MOTION - by counsel for Defendants for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (JLM)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Trinity Road, Inc. d/b/a U.S. Wine Transport shall have an extension of time to April 19, 2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and the Cross Claims filed by CrossCountry Courier, Inc. and and Nebraska Transport Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendants Trinity Road, Inc., US Wine Transport.(Barry, Andre)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Trinity Road, Inc. d/b/a U.S. Wine Transport shall have an extension of time to April 5, 2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and the Cross Claims filed by CrossCountry Courier, Inc. and and Nebraska Transport Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendants Trinity Road, Inc., US Wine Transport.(Barry, Andre)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Jason E. Engkjer. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason E. Engkjer Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3891510 by Attorney Jason E. Engkjer on behalf of Defendants CrossCountry Freight Solutions, Nebraska Transport Co., Inc..(Engkjer, Jason)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent North American Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Gold Coast Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate EAB Family Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Optimize LLC for CrossCountry Freight Solutions. by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants CrossCountry Freight Solutions, North American Holdings, Inc., Gold Coast Holdings, Inc., EAB Family Holdings LLC, Optimize LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent North American Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Gold Coast Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate EAB Family Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Optimize LLC for Nebraska Transport Co., Inc.. by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Transport Co., Inc., North American Holdings, Inc., Gold Coast Holdings, Inc., EAB Family Holdings LLC, Optimize LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant US Wine Transport(A Minnesota Corporation ) on 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Dickinson, Joshua)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney William C. Peters, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Chieftain Distribution, LLC.(Peters, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to cross defendant US Wine Transport (A Minnesota Corporation) regarding cross claims filed by Nebraska Transport Co., Inc. and CrossCountry Freight Solutions. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to US Wine Transport, Cross-Defendant regarding Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim, #7 . (Dickinson, Joshua)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to US Wine Transport, Cross-Defendant regarding Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim, #6 . (Dickinson, Joshua)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , CROSSCLAIM against US Wine Transport regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Nebraska Transport Company by CrossCountry Freight Solutions (Dickinson, Joshua)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , CROSSCLAIM against US Wine Transport regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Nebraska Transport Company by Nebraska Transport Co., Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant CrossCountry Freight Solutions. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Chieftain Distribution, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant CrossCountry Freight Solutions (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Service Return)(Dickinson, Joshua)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Chieftain Distribution, LLC from District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Case number CI 19 17 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3871832) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Nebraska Transport Company (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Summons and Complaint)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chieftain Distribution, LLC v. US Wine Transport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Wine Transport
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Road, Inc.
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrossCountry Freight Solutions
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Represented By: Jason E. Engkjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTC Logistics
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Represented By: Jason E. Engkjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Transport Company
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Transport Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Jason E. Engkjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chieftain Distribution, LLC
Represented By: William C. Peters, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?