Hurd v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Susanne R Hurd and Susanne R. Hurd
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 8:2019cv00082
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Third Extension) by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE of motion of Dismissal on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Second) by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Remand #7 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction and Proof and Service on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION (Notice) to Remand on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R Hurd. (KLF)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. United States Postal Service shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Susanne R Hurd from District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-777 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Memorandum and Order)(Wagner, Lynnett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne R Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne R. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?