Garza v. Kleine et al

Petitioner: Robert Garza
Respondent: Donald Kleine and Doug Peterson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00083
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT RELIEF on behalf of Petitioner Robert Garza. (LKO)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER on behalf of Petitioner Robert Garza. (MKR)
April 5, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Garza on 04/05/2019. Receipt number 8051347, in the amount of $50.70. (KLF)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $50.70 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 15, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to plaintiff and plaintiff institution) (LKO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Robert Garza. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (JAB)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Robert Garza. (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Donald Kleine and Doug Peterson filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Robert Garza. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Kleine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Kleine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doug Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?